Accounts and annual returns THE ELMES TRUST

Charity number: 1065074
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 09 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 18 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 05 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 05 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2005 26 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required