THE BOLSOVER DISTRICT SOCIAL CAR SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 February 1998: Standard registration
- 17 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 18 NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF AGED, SICK OR DISABLED PERSONS OR THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE DISTRICT OF BOLSOVER AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF A TRANSPORT SERVICE.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF BOLSOVER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window