Accounts and annual returns SHERBURN VISITING SCHEME SUPPORTING SENIORS

Charity number: 1068240
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 September 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 February 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 February 2021 26 days late