OLDHAM, HENSHAW AND CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Trust is the promotion of Gods Kingdom through the provision of Primary and Secondary Schools where the faith and worship of the Church of England can be taught and practised and the children brought to Confirmation and worshipping membership of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oldham
Governance
- 20 October 1997: Standard registration
- THE HENSHAW TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DANIEL JOHN ASHWORTH BURTON | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Deborah Smith | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Thomas Henry Davis | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev David Samuel John Austin | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Moores | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
DIANE WRIGLEY | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev NICHOLAS JOHN ANDREWES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MILLICENT FEBER | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
PHILIP LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.07k | £15.39k | £15.84k | £16.46k | £16.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | £11 | £2 | £1 | £906 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE BOARD OF EDUCATION DATED 8 DECEMBER 1950 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSION DATED 2 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY A MODIFICATION ORDER UNDER SECTION 82 OF THE SCHOOL STANDARDS AND FRAMEWORK ACT 1998 DATED 29 JULY 2011 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
1) PAYING THE BOARDING FEES AT THE HOSTEL IN RESPECT OF BOYS AND GIRLS BORN, OR RESIDENT IN OR NEAR OLDHAM WHO ARE ORPHANS, OR FATHERLESS OR MOTHERLESS 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUPILS BORN, OR RESIDENT, IN OR NEAR OLDHAM WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, BY AIDING THEIR EDUCATION OF TRAINING. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE PART 3 OF SCHEME DATED 8 DECEMBER 1950
Area of benefit
OLDHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oldham and Henshaw Educational Trust
155-163 The Rock
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 0ND
- Phone:
- 01618281400
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window