Financial history EASTBOURNE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1063701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.54k £4.07k £16.61k £25.72k £28.38k
Total expenditure £27.80k £3.75k £23.15k £27.41k £27.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A