Financial history ST ANDREW 'S SOUTHGATE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1063520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.84k £5.33k £7.13k £8.94k £4.48k
Total expenditure £10.03k £3.45k £2.08k £2.42k £960
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A