THE FAMILY CENTRE FIELDWAY NEW ADDINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Family centre is based in an area characterised by high levels of social deprivation. Our mission is to support and strengthen families, children and residents so they can improve the educational, health , social and employment aspects of their life. We do this by working in partnership with voluntary and statutory agencies, making available a range of services for the benefit of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £46,941 from 8 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 04 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Black | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Ghartey | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naana Mensa-Etsi | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE DAVIS | Trustee | 09 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ERIC MILNER | Trustee | 09 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.04k | £144.09k | £84.40k | £122.38k | £54.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.01k | £116.33k | £87.08k | £92.26k | £101.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | £46.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £89.50k | £83.90k | £59.00k | £40.13k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED 12TH AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE NEW ADDINGTON AND FIELDWAY REGIONS OF CROYDON BY PROVISIONS OF ADULT EDUCATION CLASSES AND CLASSES IN PARENTING AND CHILD CARE; TO RELIEVE POVERTY, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF WELFARE AND BENEFITS ADVICE, TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH; AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Family Centre
Fieldway
New Addington
CROYDON
CR0 9AZ
- Phone:
- 01689844277
- Email:
- familycentre23@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window