THE HATHAWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty Advancement of Education Medical assistance Interest free loans Advancement of religion General community benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Israel
- United States
Governance
- 22 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORMAN YOUNGER BA Hons | Chair |
|
||||||
JONATHAN ROITENBARG | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|||||
MIRIAM YOUNGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RABBI STUART SCHWALBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.37k | £121.17k | £41.34k | £77.53k | £41.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.94k | £45.88k | £42.89k | £55.34k | £59.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE ELDERLY OR PERSONS IN CONDITION 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 4) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HEREFORD DRIVE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 0JA
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window