Financial history CAROUSEL WOMENS CLUB

Charity number: 1065730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.98k £533 £4.41k £9.77k £11.13k
Total expenditure £12.98k £1.89k £5.36k £10.08k £11.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A