SIRI
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SIRI was established to provide a major health programme by the development of holistic model of care in the community. SIRI's services include: Holistic counselling, mental health/dual diagnosis management, Children and Families creative Arts, Parenting lifeskills training, immigration & asylum support, drug/alcohol misuse management, welfare benefits advice, domestic violence support, etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 August 1997: Standard registration
- 15 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SIRI BEHAVIOURAL HEALTH (Working name)
- AKPESIRI FOR MENTAL HEALTH USERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.91k | £82.42k | £131.82k | £210.72k | £228.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.88k | £68.83k | £105.86k | £202.89k | £200.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 01 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 01 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 05 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 05 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 14 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 14 April 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS RESIDENT IN THE L.B OF BRENT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF RES. ACCOMMODATION PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR CARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window