TONBRIDGE LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money on a local basis for distribution to youth, elderly, disabled and any other person or organisation requiring charitable assistance in the Tonbridge and District area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 12 September 1997: Standard registration
- 29 October 2018: Funds received from 302864 TONBRIDGE TEEN AND TWENTY CLUB
- TONBRIDGE LIONS CLUB (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Bourne | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Sleck | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Rapley | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stout | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Jesson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN GODSALL | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.69k | £15.37k | £65.45k | £58.59k | £63.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.47k | £16.61k | £53.30k | £69.05k | £58.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP OF PEOPLE OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OTHER ORGANISTION ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ("THE OBJECT") PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT APPLY THE TRUST FUND OR ANY PART THEREOF WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING THE APPROVAL OF THE LIONS CLUB AT A LIONS CLUB MEETING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE HAYDENS
TONBRIDGE
TN9 1NS
- Phone:
- 01732354174
- Email:
- petergodsall@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
tonbridgelions.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window