HARTLEPOOL CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 1066588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information, advice, emotional support, social welfare and health activities along with helping represent the needs of Deaf, Deafened & hard of hearing residents of Hartlepool.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,248
Total expenditure: £37,450

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hartlepool

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HARTLEPOOL DEAF CENTRE (HDC) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anita Duffy Chair
THE CHILD HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND LANGUAGE DEVELOPMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
PAT FOSTER Trustee 12 January 2012
None on record
PETER DUFFY Trustee
None on record
SUSAN DOVE Trustee
None on record
ANDREW DUFFY Trustee
None on record
DENIS DOVE Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM GARDNER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.89k £23.07k £49.37k £21.00k £21.25k
Total expenditure £32.84k £28.48k £50.33k £28.04k £37.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.57k £23.07k £48.37k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
One 77
177 York Road
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS26 9EQ
Phone:
07751974834
Website:

No information available