THE RUNNYMEDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runnymede is the leading independent think-tank on race equality and race relations in the UK. We generate intelligence for a multi-ethnic Britain through research, network building, leading debate, and policy engagement. Runnymede is working to build a Britain in which all citizens feel valued, enjoy equal opportunities, lead fulfilling lives, and share a common sense of belonging.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,124,820
Donations and legacies | £114.84k | |
Charitable activities | £970.09k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £37.90k | |
Other | £1.99k |
Total expenditure:
£1,375,188
Raising funds | £66.81k | |
Charitable activities | £1.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £66.81k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.31m |
People

23 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 July 1997: Standard registration
- 12 January 2021: Funds received from 328049 THE WAINWRIGHT TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Aaron Winter | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hamzahee OBE FRSA | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Paul | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Wright | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kafui Tay | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dame Donna Kinnair | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lai-Har Cheung | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Iyiola Solanke | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maya Goodfellow | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Farah Elahi | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hossein Zahir | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £483.90k | £1.34m | £1.15m | £1.93m | £1.12m | |
|
Total expenditure | £402.29k | £448.57k | £772.93k | £1.09m | £1.38m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £750.74k | £302.45k | £1.22m | £114.84k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £590.52k | £840.33k | £713.31k | £970.09k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £4.50k | £37.90k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £740 | £2.31k | £338 | £1.99k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £448.57k | £772.93k | £1.06m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £29.83k | £66.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £6.31k | £24.29k | £44.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £10.02k | £12.89k | £45.35k | £36.17k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £900.00k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £1.14m | £1.59m | £2.47m | £1.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £23.79k | £97.95k | £168.61k | £118.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE: 4.1.1 BY TEACHING, LECTURING OR OTHERWISE, STUDIES IN POLITICAL, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND NATURAL SCIENCES, THE HUMANITIES AND OTHER SUBJECTS OR DISCIPLINES SUITABLE FOR EDUCATION; 4.1.2 RACIAL HARMONY, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: (A) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, NATIONALITY, ETHNICITY, RELIGION OR SOCIO-ECONOMIC BACKGROUND; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITH A VIEW TO ENHANCING RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL, RELIGIOUS AND SOCIO ECONOMIC GROUPS; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE OF AND TO FOSTER MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING STUDY AND RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND THEIR EFFECT ON SOCIETY, AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; AND (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT AMONGST THE PUBLIC IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BK 207
Brickfields
37 Cremer St
London
- Phone:
- 02073779222
- Email:
- info@runnymedetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window