TAX ADVISERS' CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting, by way of grants and donations, charities involved with taxation, including education and the provision of tax advice for those who are unable to afford to pay for it. Supporting other charities, including those in the City of London and its immediate neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF TAX ADVISERS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.08k | £39.82k | £37.64k | £38.09k | £35.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.48k | £32.77k | £30.51k | £31.26k | £33.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 19TH MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Monck Street
LONDON
SW1P 2AP
- Phone:
- 02073400561
- Email:
- almoner@tabf.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window