DISABILITY CORNWALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of and encourage the full inclusion of people with disabilities in Cornwall by encouraging communication between disabled people, national and local groups and other bodies with an interest in disablity issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- CORNWALL DISABILITY FORUM (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.73k | £154.12k | £194.53k | £281.91k | £277.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.91k | £185.96k | £131.11k | £263.39k | £293.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 04 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 10 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 29 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 27 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 01 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 1997 AND AMENDED 30 JULY 2003 AND 6 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF AND ENCOURAGE THE FULL INCLUSION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN CORNWALL BY ENCOURAGING COMMUNICATION BETWEEN DISABLED PEOPLE, NATIONAL AND LOCAL GROUPS AND OTHER BODIES WITH AN INTEREST IN DISABILITY ISSUES. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window