FILWOOD HOPE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide free advice services, counselling and support with form filling, writing letters and contacting statutory bodies to people in the Knowle West Estate, in particular, and generally in South Bristol
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 14 January 1998: Standard registration
- 11 January 2018: Funds received from 1149789 TREE OF LIFE : KNOWLE WEST
- FILWOOD HOPE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Pope | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clive Hamilton | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tilly Marston | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev BERNARD MORRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.07k | £41.02k | £36.40k | £89.02k | £58.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.50k | £52.33k | £49.73k | £58.30k | £70.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.56k | £10.78k | £9.31k | £7.00k | £17.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30 DECEMBER 1997 as amended on 25 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS BOTH CHRISTIAN AND NON-CHRISTIAN SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DIFFICULTIES, FINANCIAL DIFFICULTIES, AND STRESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FILWOOD HOPE ADVICE CENTRE
11-13 FILWOOD BROADWAY
BRISTOL
BS4 1JL
- Phone:
- 01179634566
- Email:
- advice@filwoodhope.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window