CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH, MOUNT HOREB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE ACTIVE IN CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AND ARE OPEN TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC. THESE ACTIVITIES INCLUDE: 1. CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL SOUL WINNING PROGRAMME. 2. EDUCATION/TRAINING - BASIC COMPUTER. 3. YOUTH PROGRAMME. 4. LOW PRICE COMMONDITIES DISTRIBUTION TO THE COMMUNITY. 5. ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN ECUMENICAL ACTIVITIES. 6. COUNSELLING AND PROVISION OF EMPLOYMENT INFORMATION SERVICES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
- Throughout London
- Belgium
- Nigeria
Governance
- 14 August 1997: Standard registration
- MOUNT HOREB (Working name)
- MOUNT HOREB INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM CHURCH MOVEMENT MOUNT HOREB, LONDON (Previous name)
- CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM CHURCH MOVEMENT, MOUNT HOREB, LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Babajide Akinlade | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olufunke Aduloju | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Yemisi Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Special Apostle Olapade Adewumi Ola | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pastor/Prophet Emmanuel Oluwasegun Kofoworade Ademoroti | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Special Mother Elizabeth Adefoluke Adenike Ayanda Sp Mother | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
LADY EVANGELIST ESTHER AYOBAMI ADESANYA | Trustee | 05 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SPECIAL APOSTLE ADEMOLA ANIMASHAUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.18k | £60.52k | £61.97k | £64.79k | £78.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.89k | £46.01k | £60.19k | £56.84k | £84.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/01/2009 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2014
Charitable objects
[I] THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [II] THE RELIEF OF POVERTY [III] THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN AFTER SCHOOL CLUB, BASIC COMPUTER TRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF MENTORING AND COUNSELLING SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
602 WOOLWICH ROAD
CHARLTON
LONDON
SE7 8RH
- Phone:
- 02033020620
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window