GAMBIA SCHOOL APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds are raised by donations, fundraising stalls and activities to purchase items of equipment and school requisites for a number of schools in the North Bank Region of The Gambia. The charity buys these items both in The Gambia and here in the UK, in this case these items are then carried or shipped to The Gambia for distribution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- The Gambia
Governance
- 12 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverly Ann Bunting | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sedgwick | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MCCONNELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE TOYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.84k | £4.26k | £3.85k | £6.23k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.68k | £6.42k | £3.58k | £3.15k | £3.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
THE GAMBIA, WEST AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 WORKSOP ROAD
MASTIN MOOR
CHESTERFIELD
S43 3BN
- Phone:
- 01246474449
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window