Financial history ABERCONWY DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE

Charity number: 1078963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £204.97k £251.55k £302.62k £272.64k £330.20k
Total expenditure £223.26k £233.62k £236.80k £244.64k £330.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £63.40k N/A £180.39k £171.69k £193.16k