UGLEY RECREATION HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs local village hall for use of villagers and local people in order to foster community spirit and helps educational and recreational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 January 1998: Standard registration
- 26 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 26 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1198224 UGLEY VILLAGE HALL CIO
- UGLEY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.72k | £23.91k | £15.94k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.18k | £11.85k | £14.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.95k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 28TH JULY 1920 AND INDENTURE DATED 31ST JULY 1920
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A RECREATION HALL FOR THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF UGLEY AFORESAID AND FOR ANY OTHER PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE RECREATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID VILLAGE AS THE TRUSTEES OR TRUSTEE MAY THINK FIT OR DESIRABLE.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF UGLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window