WINIFRED WHARTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities of a historic nature in the Borough of Wellingborough in the Dulley's Baths building, including the Wellingborough Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 03 March 2000: Standard registration
- THE WELLINGBOROUGH MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Anthony Townson | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Julie Smith | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lees | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Bean | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
COLIN FREDERICK BAILEY | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
IRENE HELEN WHARTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.10k | £6.91k | £27.51k | £43.79k | £36.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.50k | £31.01k | £23.49k | £31.47k | £52.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 April 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 April 2025 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 341 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNS PEOPLE OF THE BOROUGH OF WELLINGBOROUGH AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE BOROUGH OF WELLINGBOROUGH IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. (11) TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM/HERITAGE CENTRE IN WHICH TO DISPLAY SUCH COLLECTIONS OF ARTIFACTS AND SUCH OTHER COLLECTIONS WHETHER OR NOT RELATING TO AND DEMONSTRATING ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF WELLINGBOROUGH AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (111) TO ESTABLISH, PRESERVE, ENHANCE, MANAGE AND DEVELOP COLLECTIONS OF ARTIFACTS WHICH DEMONSTRATE ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF THE BOROUGH OF WELLINGBOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGHOUT THE AGES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CURRENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS. (1V) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF WELLINGBOROUGH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WELLINGBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Castle Way
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN8 1XB
- Phone:
- 01933225447
- Email:
- wellingboroughmuseum@msn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window