JOHANNESBURG CHILD WELFARE SOCIETY UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 16 October 1997: Standard registration
- 14 November 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE UK FRIENDS OF JOHANNESBURG CHILD WELFARE SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £960 | £259 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.93k | £1.73k | £2.08k | £1.18k | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN NEED THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window