BARROW HILL ENGINE SHED SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of Barrow Hill Roundhouse and associated buildings and railway yard, operation of railway museum therein.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 10 November 1997: Standard registration
- B. H. E. S. S. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ALEXANDER MARK ROBINSON | Chair | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Burgess | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Crawley | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Paul Beardsley | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robin David Oxborough | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN BRAILSFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.67k | £178.34k | £175.21k | £98.40k | £157.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.91k | £109.19k | £85.52k | £149.26k | £164.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 JANUARY 2010 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 29 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF CHESTERFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE LOCOMOTIVE ENGINE SHEDS KNOWN AS BARROW HILL STAVELEY AFORESAID IN THE FROM OF BUILDINGS ( INCLUDING ANY BUILDINGS AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST AND BY MAINTAINING A COLLECTION OF ITEMS RELEVANT TO THE AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barrow Hill Roundhouse
Barrow Hill
CHESTERFIELD
S43 2PR
- Phone:
- 01246472450
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window