Financial history BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA U.K. NETWORK

Charity number: 1067411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.57k £173.36k £143.58k £210.35k £624.47k
Total expenditure £96.49k £90.77k £136.35k £158.65k £602.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £44.55k £54.73k £122.43k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £297
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £808
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £155.94k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £602.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0