THE PETRA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to relieve poverty in Ukraine and other countries by giving financial and/or material support to individuals, families, or other charitable organisations whose aims and activities are in line with those of the trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Peterborough City
- Kenya
- Ukraine
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 07 November 1997: Standard registration
- 01 December 2019: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- PETRA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.56k | £20.86k | £14.17k | £12.23k | £4.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.72k | £27.22k | £35.90k | £19.18k | £43.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1997 , SUPPLEMENTARY DEED DATED 12 OCTOBER 1997.
Charitable objects
THE TRUST SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUNDS AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN ANY AREA OF THE WORLD . PARTICULARLY , BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING IN EASTERN EUROPE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window