BETJEMAN MILLENNIUM PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ownership and management of a park for public uses, especially both the education of all age groups concerning local heritage and conservation issues and passive recreation, including drama and art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £9,799 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 August 1997: Standard registration
- BETJEMAN MILLENNIUM PARK (Working name)
- LETCOMBE BROOK (WANTAGE) CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FLORA DAPHNE NUTTGENS | Chair | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kingston | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Philip Cowieson | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helena Whall | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE ANTHONY GASHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN VANDORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.90k | £5.32k | £2.89k | £2.92k | £11.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.96k | £1.07k | £4.81k | £2.68k | £12.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 04 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2016 as amended on 24 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF A PUBLIC PARK AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AMENITIES FORMERLY KNOWN AS "WHEELERS ORCHARD") ANY OTHER LAND OR AMENITY AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
WANTAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Wallingford Street
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX12 8AU
- Phone:
- 07813 984607
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window