Accounts and annual returns BANBURY ANIMAL RESCUE AND KINDNESS SERVICE

Charity number: 1064556
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 February 2017 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 February 2017 110 days late
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 06 January 2016 67 days late
Annual return 31 December 2013 31 December 2014 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 31 December 2014 61 days late