Accounts and annual returns THE CONGLETON AMATEUR YOUTH THEATRE

Charity Number: 1071221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 28 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 June 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 13 June 2024 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 August 2023 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required