Financial history THE CONGLETON AMATEUR YOUTH THEATRE

Charity Number: 1071221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £17.56k £796 £14.62k £32.66k £48.88k
Total expenditure £14.87k £1.46k £20.04k £23.92k £41.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A