Accounts and annual returns THE SOCIETY FOR ADVANCED LEGAL STUDIES

Charity number: 1069631
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 October 2019 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 June 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 21 September 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required