THE EARDISLAND DOVECOTE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of unique two storey Georgian Dovecote open every day free providing local heritage displays and small not for profit community shop, free car park, Englands oldest AA telephone kiosk and riverside picnic area. All maintained by volunteers. Trust does not have sufficient resources to provide grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 22 October 1997: Standard registration
- EARDISLAND DOVECOTE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Butters | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Atkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Maclean Vernon | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHELLEY CONNOP | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £1.98k | £260 | £1.87k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £845 | £2.92k | £50 | £3.79k | £1.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
T PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING EARDISLAND; TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHITECTURE, HISTORY AND GEOGRAPHY OF THE AREA BENEFIT; TO ACQUIRE THE EARDISLAND MANOR HOUSE DOVECOTE AND ANY OTHER LAND OR PROPERTY. SPECIFICALLY, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD A TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE OBJECT OF ACQUIRING AND HOLDING THE HISTORIC BUILDING OF THE EARDISLAND MANOR HOUSE DOVECOTE AND PRESERVING IT FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS OF PARISHIONERS AND VISITORS ALLOWING PUBLIC ACCESS TO IT AND DISPLAYING THE HISTORY OF THE BUILDING AND UTILISING IT AS AN INFORMATION CENTRE FOR THE VILLAGE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oaks
Eardisland
LEOMINSTER
Herefordshire
HR6 9BG
- Phone:
- 01544388692
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window