DEVA JUDOKWAI SPORTS AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have an old church/ground's, which has been converted into a sports & recreation centre, which provides low cost opportunities for minority sports clubs, groups, serving the local community as a venue for group activities, i.e. clubs such as judo, aikido, tai-chi, family martial arts, tai kwondo and more
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 16 December 1997: Standard registration
- DEVA JUDOKWAI SPORTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
R A KENDRICK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN PAMELA KENDRICK | Trustee | 11 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christina Chan | Trustee | 11 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.33k | £5.33k | £12.34k | £12.29k | £15.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.90k | £9.20k | £9.18k | £10.79k | £13.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING AND TEACHING JUDO AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR OTHER SPORTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS OF ALL AGES AND ABILITIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR SUCH PEOPLE
Area of benefit
CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 FFORDD HAEARN
PENYFFORDD
CHESTER
CH4 0JA
- Phone:
- 07963081168
- Email:
- a.s.kendrick@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window