SNIP INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1064664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDE EQUIPMENT TO OVERSEAS ORGANISATIONS TO ENABLE THEM TO CATCH/NEUTER/AND RETURN FERRAL CATS AND DOGS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £21,106
Total expenditure: £1,985

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Abu Dhabi
  • Afghanistan
  • Ajman
  • Akrotiri
  • Aland Islands
  • Albania
  • Algeria
  • Andorra
  • Angola
  • Anguilla
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Armenia
  • Aruba
  • Ascension
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Azerbaijan
  • Bahrain
  • Baker Island
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belgium
  • Belize
  • Benin
  • Bermuda
  • Bhutan
  • Bonaire
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Botswana
  • British Indian Ocean Territory
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Brunei
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Cape Verde
  • Cayman Islands
  • Central African Republic
  • Ceuta
  • Chad
  • China
  • Christmas Island
  • Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
  • Comoros
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Cook Islands
  • Costa Rica
  • Croatia
  • Cuba
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Dhekelia
  • Djibouti
  • Dominica
  • Dominican Republic
  • Dubai
  • Easter Island
  • East Timor
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Eritrea
  • Estonia
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Faroe Islands
  • Fiji
  • Finland
  • France
  • French Polynesia
  • Fujairah
  • Gabon
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Gibraltar
  • Greece
  • Greenland
  • Grenada
  • Guadeloupe
  • Guam
  • Guatemala
  • Guernsey
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Haiti
  • Honduras
  • Hong Kong
  • Howland Island
  • Hungary
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Ireland
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Jarvis Island
  • Johnston Atoll
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kingman Reef
  • Kiribati
  • Kosovo
  • Kuwait
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Latvia
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Liechtenstein
  • Lithuania
  • Luxembourg
  • Macau
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Maldives
  • Mali
  • Malta
  • Marshall Islands
  • Martinique
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mayotte
  • Melilla
  • Mexico
  • Micronesia
  • Midway Islands
  • Moldova
  • Monaco
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Montserrat
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nauru
  • Navassa Island
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Caledonia
  • New Zealand
  • Nicaragua
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Niue
  • Norfolk Island
  • Northern Mariana Islands
  • North Korea
  • Norway
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Oman
  • Pakistan
  • Palau
  • Palmyra Atoll
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Philippines
  • Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Puerto Rico
  • Qatar
  • Ras Al-khaimah
  • Réunion
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Saba
  • Saint Barthélemy
  • Saint Helena
  • Saint-Martin
  • Saint Pierre And Miquelon
  • Saint Vincent
  • Samoa
  • San Marino
  • São Tomé And Principe
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Seychelles
  • Sierra Leone
  • Singapore
  • Sint Eustatius
  • Sint Maarten
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • Solomon Islands
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • South Sudan
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sudan
  • Svalbard And Jan Mayen
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Syria
  • Taiwan
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Bahamas
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Tokelau
  • Tonga
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Tristan Da Cunha
  • Tunisia
  • Turkey
  • Turkmenistan
  • Turks And Caicos Islands
  • Tuvalu
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Umm Al-quwain
  • United Arab Emirates
  • Uzbekistan
  • Vanuatu
  • Vatican City
  • Vietnam
  • Wake Island
  • Wallis And Futuna
  • Western Sahara
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Juliette Jones Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Adelle Goodman Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Melanie Jane Davies Trustee 30 August 2019
KOTOR KITTIES
Received: On time
NIGEL MASON Trustee 16 May 2015
None on record
MS SIRU ANNIKA LAHDENIEMI Trustee 22 April 2013
None on record
ALEXANDRA LISETTE CARTIER VAN DISSEL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.42k £11.24k £10.75k £11.36k £21.11k
Total expenditure £7.53k £23.25k £57.43k £29.69k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
79 Warwick Avenue
BEDFORD
MK40 2EG
Phone:
07778 955346