GREAT EXPECTATIONS MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1067764
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hold seminars for the 'young adults' to bring them awareness of crime in the UK involving them and how to stay clear of such. Currently, we are in the process of setting up an orphanage in Ghana in a town called Mankessim which serves a lot of small villages in the area. We meet regularly on some weekdays to give support to anyone who needs it.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £4,000
Total expenditure: £4,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Enfield
  • Ghana

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BEATRICE OWUSU-ANSAH Chair 29 January 2016
None on record
Kofi Manu Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.00k £7.50k £4.00k £5.00k £4.00k
Total expenditure £5.00k £7.50k £4.00k £5.00k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 March 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2022 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GREAT EXPECTATIONS MINISTRIES
8 CENTRE WAY
CLAVERINGS INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
LONDON
N9 0AP
Phone:
07424089177
Website:

No information available