Financial history KEIGHLEY COMMUNITY NURSERY LTD

Charity Number: 1064202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £328.69k £373.88k £400.26k £488.31k £536.97k
Total expenditure £366.61k £326.42k £387.82k £464.85k £515.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.57k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £805
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £534.60k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £513.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £260
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.25k