Accounts and annual returns THE OLD ALRESFORD PLACE TRUST
Charity number: 1065509
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 12 November 2009 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 25 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 09 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 05 February 2009 | 463 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 05 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 05 July 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window