Accounts and annual returns NAINAI MANIMEKALAI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068522
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 July 2024 19 May 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2023 17 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2023 17 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 July 2022 21 July 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2020 15 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2020 15 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window