ENGLAND AND WALES BLIND GOLF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association is established for the recreation of the blind by the provision of training in golf facilities so as to improve the conditions of life. We also arrange golfing events for our members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 October 1997: Standard registration
- ENGLISH BLIND GOLF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon William Lawson | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debra Jayne White | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Colin Paul Turner | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Samantha Logie | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Cameron Macdonald | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Large | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
John William Kennedy | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Gilford | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Valerie Daniels | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.29k | £25.37k | £63.99k | £109.39k | £105.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.05k | £61.00k | £94.27k | £115.01k | £101.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/04/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN GOLF FACILITIES SO AS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Morris Crocker Ltd
50 North Street
HAVANT
Hampshire
PO9 1QU
- Phone:
- 07789740094
- Email:
- FD@ewblindgolf.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window