EAST LONDON COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.Provide free advice, information and representation to asylum seekers, refugees, migrants and others in matters of asylum, immigration, housing, debt ,welfare benefits, hate crime and domestic violence, education, training and employment. 2. Low rate fee paying service in imigration is available for clients, who are not eligible for public funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 September 1997: Standard registration
- REFUGEE ADVICE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr QADIR BAKHSH MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clive Raymond Lucking | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Frimeong Manso | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SAID AWEYS | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABDUL QAYYUM SHEIKH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.22k | £63.69k | £32.69k | £29.15k | £34.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.37k | £38.96k | £35.80k | £34.24k | £34.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.63k | £8.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH MAY 1997 AND AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 26 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES, MIGRANTS AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WITH RESTRICTED INCOME WHO ARE RESIDENT IN GREATER LONDON BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS OF ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND ENGLISH LANGUAGE CLASSES.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAHIR COMMUNITY HOUSE
702 HIGH ROAD LEYTON
LONDON
E10 6JP
- Phone:
- 02085581865
- Email:
- Finance.admin@elclas.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window