HIGH HURSTWOOD SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1064148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting Educational Visits, Sports, Fundraising and Building Improvement

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £763
Total expenditure: £10,060

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 August 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Cook Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Ann Shepherd Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Peter Duck Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
Edward Bartlett Trustee 30 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.33k £12.26k £3.81k £993 £763
Total expenditure £2.44k £0 £17 £60 £10.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 March 2025 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 March 2025 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HIGH HURSTWOOD CE SCHOOL
HIGH HURSTWOOD
NR. UCKFIELD
EAST SUSSEX
Phone:
01825733231
Website:

No information available