Financial history FRIENDS OF ELSIE BRIGGS HOUSE

Charity number: 1064760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.41k £9.13k £5.67k £15.87k £17.98k
Total expenditure £36.60k £4.66k £16.15k £9.06k £6.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A