CHARIOTTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We supply transport for people with disabilities to maintain their independence. With wheelchair adapted vehicles. All drivers are trained and checked voulunteers. Getting people out can help with social isolation and loneliness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £36,219 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 22 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen James Harvey | Chair | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Robinson | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Eastwood | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STORY | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND STANLEY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.06k | £70.88k | £87.41k | £126.69k | £114.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.60k | £105.89k | £117.40k | £125.45k | £128.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.10k | £36.46k | £30.46k | £43.74k | £36.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 1997 AND 27 NOVEMBER 1997 AND 24 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SCHEME FOR ANYONE LIVING WITHIN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF WREXHAM WHO IS UNABLE OR HAS DIFFICULTY IN USING EXISTING PUBLIC TRANSPORT, BECAUSE OF DISABILITY OR ILL HEALTH. B) TO HELP PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES/ SENSORY IMPAIRMENT TO RETAIN INDEPENDENCE AND OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH TRANSPORT APPROPRIATE TO THEIR INDIVIDUAL NEEDS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF WREXHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chariotts
Unit 29
Whitegate Industrial Estate
Whitegate Road
WREXHAM
LL13 8UG
- Phone:
- 01978312888
- Email:
- chariotts@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window