THE WESTBOURNE COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and encourage the development of a wide range of community based activities. Ensuring that all of the activities are accessible to all sections of the community without discrimination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wirral
Governance
- 12 September 1997: Standard registration
- 21 May 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 21 May 2014: Funds transferred to 1151658 WESTBOURNE HALL COMMUNITY TRUST
- WESTBOURNE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.27k | £25.36k | £25.76k | £41.64k | £38.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.31k | £11.48k | £27.21k | £13.00k | £16.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 16 April 2014 | 75 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 01 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 18 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 19 August 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED 4 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION SOCIAL WELFARE AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS. TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
WEST KIRBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window