Financial history BRENT CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1066691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £462.81k £221.51k £318.06k £375.37k £738.78k
Total expenditure £492.71k £248.25k £351.50k £408.94k £601.65k
Income from government contracts £141.30k £38.33k £255.07k £263.19k £403.06k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £24.35k £334.06k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.73k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £733.39k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £601.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0