Accounts and annual returns JAMIA MASJID ANWAR-E-MADINA AND ISLAMIC STUDY CENTRE

Charity number: 1101647
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2025 1095 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2025 1095 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days