THE BARLEY HALL TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 25 September 1997: Standard registration
- 25 March 2008: Removed
- 25 March 2008: Funds transferred to 509060 YORK ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST FOR EXCAVATION AND RESEA...
- BARLEY HALL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.11k | £96.04k | £68.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.19k | £87.40k | £74.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 27 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 27 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 11 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 11 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 09 November 2005 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 09 November 2005 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HISTORY OR SIMILAR AND TO ACQUIRE AND TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE OF THE PAST IN YORK AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window