TYNEMOUTH BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPORT AND RECREATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gilbert | Chair | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
David McGuire | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Black | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.54k | £2.82k | £5.75k | £6.34k | £6.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.97k | £2.78k | £9.80k | £6.98k | £8.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 1998 AND 14 OCTOBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF BOWLING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Fairfield Drive
NORTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE30 3AG
- Phone:
- 01912520881
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window