CATHOLIC NATIONAL LIBRARY

Charity Number: 1064460
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Catholic lending library - with postal service, with reference section, also family and historical records.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014

Total income: £8,692
Total expenditure: £7,590

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 1997: Standard registration
  • 16 June 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 16 June 2016: Funds transferred to 1127929 STONYHURST
  • 16 June 2016: Funds transferred to 240701 THE EMPRESS EUGENIE MEMORIAL TRUST (REALTY)
  • 16 June 2016: Funds transferred to 1155776 Academy of the Annunciation
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CATHOLIC CENTRAL LIBRARY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £12.73k £11.06k £8.41k £14.36k £8.69k
Total expenditure £25.52k £16.02k £11.06k £10.89k £7.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 21 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2013 12 November 2014 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 13 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 10 January 2013 On Time