Trustees JUST FOR DOGS (EAST MIDLANDS)
Charity number: 1064905

Charity reporting is up to date (145 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Karen Bartram | Trustee | 10 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Ria Smith | Trustee | 10 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rose Dean | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELIZABETH CARTER | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOUG SMITH | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUNE MARGARET SMITH | Trustee | 20 September 1997 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.