THE DIANA, PRINCESS OF WALES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BY GIVING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS, CHAMPIONING CHARITABLE CAUSES, ADVOCACY, CAMPAIGNING AND AWARENESS RAISING THE FUND WORKS TO SECURE SUSTAINABLE IMPROVEMENT IN THE LIVES OF THE MOST DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN THE UK AND AROUND THE WORLD. THE FUND'S ACTIVITIES ARE DIVIDED INTO FOUR INITIATIVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2001: Standard registration
- 15 July 2003: Removed (Duplicate registration)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Diana Princess of Wales Memorial Fund Trustee Company | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1997, AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 13 JANUARY 1998, 7 DECEMBER 1998, 24 OCTOBER AND 5 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITIES OR ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES MAY HAVE REGARD (BUT WITHOUT FETTERING THEIR DISCRETION) TO THOSE CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE CAUSES WITH WHICH DIANA, PRINCESS OF WALES WAS ASSOCIATED DURING HER LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 20 December 2001 : Standard registration
- 15 July 2003 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kensington Palace
Palace Green
London
W8 4PU
- Phone:
- 0207 101 2963
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window